1 | 1 | | Second Regular Session |
---|
2 | 2 | | Seventy-fourth General Assembly |
---|
3 | 3 | | STATE OF COLORADO |
---|
4 | 4 | | INTRODUCED |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | LLS NO. 24-0600.01 Anna Petrini x5497 |
---|
8 | 8 | | SENATE BILL 24-130 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Senate Committees House Committees |
---|
10 | 10 | | Judiciary |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | C |
---|
13 | 13 | | ONCERNING RAISING THE LIMITA TION ON NONECONOMIC DAMAGES101 |
---|
14 | 14 | | IN MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTIONS .102 |
---|
15 | 15 | | Bill Summary |
---|
16 | 16 | | (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does |
---|
17 | 17 | | not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill |
---|
18 | 18 | | passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that |
---|
19 | 19 | | applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at |
---|
20 | 20 | | http://leg.colorado.gov |
---|
21 | 21 | | .) |
---|
22 | 22 | | Existing law limits the amount recoverable for noneconomic |
---|
23 | 23 | | damages in medical malpractice actions to $300,000. Beginning January |
---|
24 | 24 | | 1, 2025, the bill incrementally increases the noneconomic damages |
---|
25 | 25 | | limitation to $500,000 over the course of 5 years. |
---|
26 | 26 | | SENATE SPONSORSHIP |
---|
27 | 27 | | Mullica and Will, |
---|
28 | 28 | | HOUSE SPONSORSHIP |
---|
29 | 29 | | Brown, |
---|
30 | 30 | | Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. |
---|
32 | 32 | | Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 1. Legislative declaration. The general assembly2 |
---|
34 | 34 | | finds and declares that updating the monetary limitations on damages for3 |
---|
35 | 35 | | direct or derivative noneconomic loss or injury serves the purpose and4 |
---|
36 | 36 | | intent of the "Health Care Availability Act".5 |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 13-64-302, add6 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1)(d) as follows:7 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 13-64-302. Limitation of liability - interest on damages.8 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) (d) (I) E |
---|
41 | 41 | | FFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2025, THE DAMAGES LIMITATION OF9 |
---|
42 | 42 | | THREE HUNDRED THOUSAND DOLLARS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION (1)(c)10 |
---|
43 | 43 | | OF THIS SECTION IS INCREASED TO THREE HUNDRED FORTY THOUSAND11 |
---|
44 | 44 | | DOLLARS, WHICH INCREASED AMOUNT APPLIES TO ACTS OR OMISSIONS12 |
---|
45 | 45 | | OCCURRING ON OR AFTER SAID DATE .13 |
---|
46 | 46 | | (II) E |
---|
47 | 47 | | FFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2026, THE DAMAGES LIMITATION OF14 |
---|
48 | 48 | | THREE HUNDRED FORTY THOUSAND DOLLARS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION15 |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1)(d)(I) |
---|
50 | 50 | | OF THIS SECTION IS INCREASED TO THREE HUNDRED EIGHTY16 |
---|
51 | 51 | | THOUSAND DOLLARS, WHICH INCREASED AMOUNT APPLIES TO ACTS OR17 |
---|
52 | 52 | | OMISSIONS OCCURRING ON OR AFTER SAID DATE .18 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (III) E |
---|
54 | 54 | | FFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2027, THE DAMAGES LIMITATION OF19 |
---|
55 | 55 | | THREE HUNDRED EIGHTY THOUSAND DOLLARS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION20 |
---|
56 | 56 | | (1)(d)(II) |
---|
57 | 57 | | OF THIS SECTION IS INCREASED TO FOUR HUNDRED TWENTY21 |
---|
58 | 58 | | THOUSAND DOLLARS, WHICH INCREASED AMOUNT APPLIES TO ACTS OR22 |
---|
59 | 59 | | OMISSIONS OCCURRING ON OR AFTER SAID DATE .23 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (IV) E |
---|
61 | 61 | | FFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2028, THE DAMAGES LIMITATION OF24 |
---|
62 | 62 | | FOUR HUNDRED TWENTY THOUSAND DOLLARS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION25 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (1)(d)(III) |
---|
64 | 64 | | OF THIS SECTION IS INCREASED TO FOUR HUNDRED SIXTY26 |
---|
65 | 65 | | THOUSAND DOLLARS, WHICH INCREASED AMOUNT APPLIES TO ACTS OR27 |
---|
66 | 66 | | SB24-130 |
---|
67 | 67 | | -2- OMISSIONS OCCURRING ON OR AFTER SAID DATE .1 |
---|
68 | 68 | | (V) E |
---|
69 | 69 | | FFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2029, THE DAMAGES LIMITATION OF2 |
---|
70 | 70 | | FOUR HUNDRED SIXTY THOUSAND DOLLARS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION3 |
---|
71 | 71 | | (1)(d)(IV) |
---|
72 | 72 | | OF THIS SECTION IS INCREASED TO FIVE HUNDRED THOUSAND4 |
---|
73 | 73 | | DOLLARS, WHICH INCREASED AMOUNT APPLIES TO ACTS OR OMISSIONS5 |
---|
74 | 74 | | OCCURRING ON OR AFTER SAID DATE .6 |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 3. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,7 |
---|
76 | 76 | | determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate8 |
---|
77 | 77 | | preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for9 |
---|
78 | 78 | | the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state10 |
---|
79 | 79 | | institutions.11 |
---|
80 | 80 | | SB24-130 |
---|
81 | 81 | | -3- |
---|