|
05/17/2024
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/07/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
|
|
|