Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 30, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note April 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024