03/12/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
03/12/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/12/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |