Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill March 11, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024