|
05/18/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/07/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
|
|
|