Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB164 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/03/2024

                    Page 1 
June 3, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0660  
Sen. Buckner; Lundeen 
Rep. McCluskie; Pugliese  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 3, 2024 
Signed into Law  
John Armstrong | 303-866-6289 
john.armstrong@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: INSITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION TRANSPARENCY REQUIREMENTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill modifies processes regarding credit transfers between institutions of higher 
education and requires students to receive certain cost information. The bill will 
increase expenditures for the state and institutions of higher education beginning in 
FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill makes changes to state law related to transfer of college credit between institutions of 
higher education. 
Student rights. The bill adds certain rights to students enrolled in postsecondary institutions, 
including: 
 transparency of the cost of postsecondary education; 
 seamless transfer of courses in the guaranteed transfer pathway matrix, which are 
introductory courses with equivalent learning outcomes between institutions; 
 transparency regarding if credits are accepted or rejected from an institution; 
 the ability to appeal an institution’s decision not to accept transfer credits; and 
 the right to know which work-related and prior learning experiences are awarded credit. 
The Department of Higher Education (CDHE) must adopt implementation policies for public 
institutions of higher education by April 1, 2025.  
   Page 2 
June 3, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
Council of Higher Education Representatives. The bill requires the Council of Higher 
Education Representatives (council) to add representatives to ensure equal representation of 
institutions by December 31, 2024, and to review the list of courses in the guaranteed transfer 
pathway matrix by October 1, 2025, and annually thereafter. As part of this review, the council 
will identify courses that have the most transfer enrollment, which courses are less likely to 
receive credit upon transferring and where misalignment occurs between courses in the state’s 
guaranteed transfer pathways matrix.  
The bill clarifies that students who have completed a guaranteed transfer pathway matrix course 
must receive credit from the institutions receiving the transfer. Institutions may not require 
students to take the same or similar courses as those in the matrix that the student has 
completed. Courses that cannot be applied to a major or program’s requirements must be used 
to fulfill general elective course requirements. Students who change majors must have their 
transfer credits re-evaluated. 
Data reporting. Beginning January 2026, and annually thereafter, CDHE must include as part of 
its annual SMART Act hearing certain information regarding credit transfers. 
Violations of transfer policy. The bill grants CDHE the authority to enforce violations of 
transfer policies against institutions and overturn a course transfer decision made by an 
institution.   
Appeals process. CDHE must develop an appeal process for students who are denied transfer 
of credits in consultation with institutions of higher education, and may adopt rules as necessary 
to implement this process.  
Acceptance of transfer credits. Institutions must provide notice to students regarding the 
acceptance or denial of transfer credits within 30 days after the date the student’s official 
transcript and admission application materials are received by the institution. Institutions must 
post their process and timeline for reviewing transfer requests on their website.  
Background 
The Council of Higher Education Representatives, established in 2001, consists of representatives 
from institutions of higher education and staff from the CDHE. The council meets periodically to 
establish common course numberings, classify certain courses as general education courses, and 
jointly develop the statewide transfer pathways matrix, which allows institutions to map which 
courses can be accepted for credit when students transfer.   
State Expenditures 
CDHE will have increased workload to convene members of the council to update transfer 
policies, adopt rules for institutional violations of transfer policy, and develop an appeal process 
for students who have been denied transfer credits. Staff from CDHE will have increased 
workload to accomplish these activities and review student appeals of denied credit and issue 
rulings to institutions. Current staff are expected to be able to accomplish these activities within 
existing resources.  Page 3 
June 3, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
Initially, the number of appeals of denied credit transfers is expected to be minimal. As 
knowledge of the appeals process grows among institutions and students, appeals may increase 
in following years. If CDHE requires more staff to handle these appeals, they will be requested 
through the annual budget process.  
Institutions of Higher Education   
Institutions will have increased costs beginning in FY 2024-25 to implement the new 
requirements for transfer students and participate in any appeals to CDHE, The fiscal note 
assumes these costs will be funded through adjustments to institutional tuition, fees, and other 
revenue sources. The General Assembly may also consider a General Fund appropriation for 
these costs in initial years. Annual costs will vary depending on the institution. 
Institutional costs include: 
 
 staff to make decisions on accepting transfer credits in a condensed 30-day time frame; 
 including additional information in financial aid disclosures to students;  
 training on new requirements; and 
 additional documentation of transfer credit decisions.  
 
Staffing costs will vary considerably based on the size of the institution and the number of 
transfer students they accept.  
Technical Note 
The bill’s safety clause will require CDHE and the institutions to immediately develop the appeal 
process for denied credit transfer. Because the council will need to meet to standardize this 
process, the appeal process is likely to be available beginning January 1, 2025, to allow the 
required time to refine the appeal process for students and institutions.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed by the Governor and took effect on May 18. 2024. 
Departmental Difference 
Several institutions of higher education indicated the need for a General Fund appropriation in 
order to implement the bill. These costs ranged from $305,000 and 3.5 FTE to $3.6 million and 
16.0 FTE in FY 2024-25. The fiscal note assumes that these additional requirements can be met 
using institutional revenue. Ultimately, this funding decision is at the discretion of the General 
Assembly. 
   Page 4 
June 3, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Higher Education  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.