Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 8, 2024
Fiscal Note March 12, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill March 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill April 5, 2024