|
05/17/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
|
|
|