Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 5, 2024
Fiscal Note April 22, 2024
Fiscal Note April 1, 2024
Fiscal Note March 26, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2024

Amended

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024