Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 26, 2024
Fiscal Note April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024