LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJM005
Action History
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SJM005
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SJM005
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/26/2024
Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/22/2024
Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/15/2024
Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/22/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/08/2024
Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/08/2024
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to