House | 04/09/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/14/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |