Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 13, 2025
Fiscal Note January 23, 2025
Bill January 8, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Amended

Bill May 3, 2025