Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Bill April 25, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Amended

Bill May 2, 2025
Bill May 1, 2025