04/01/2010 | File Number 282 | |||
04/01/2010 | House Calendar Number 157 | |||
04/01/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/01/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2010 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |