05/04/2010 | House Calendar Number 500 | |||
05/04/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2010 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |||
05/03/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/03/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/22/2010 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/22/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/22/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/22/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/16/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/01/2010 | File Number 238 | |||
04/01/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 170 | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/11/2010 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |