Connecticut 2010 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00109 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 109
2-February Session, 2010 *_____SB00109GAE___042210____*
2+February Session, 2010 *_____SB00109TRA___041410____*
33
44 General Assembly
55
66 Substitute Bill No. 109
77
88 February Session, 2010
99
10-*_____SB00109GAE___042210____*
10+*_____SB00109TRA___041410____*
1111
1212 AN ACT CONCERNING THE BRADLEY BOARD OF DIRECTORS.
1313
1414 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1515
1616 Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 15-101mm of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2010):
1717
1818 (b) (1) The Bradley Board of Directors shall consist of seven members, appointed as follows: The Commissioner of Transportation and the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, each serving ex-officio, a representative appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives from the Connecticut Transportation Strategy Board, created by section 13b-57e, a representative appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives from among the members of the Bradley International Community Advisory Board, as created by section 15-101pp and three private sector members appointed as follows: (A) The Governor shall appoint one member, who shall be the chairperson, and whose first term shall expire on June 30, 2005, (B) the president pro tempore of the Senate shall appoint one member whose first term shall expire on June 30, 2005, (C) the minority leader of the Senate shall appoint one member whose first term shall expire on June 30, 2005. The term of office of each successor shall be four years. The term of each appointed member of the Bradley Board of Directors shall expire on June 30, 2010, or when such member's successor is appointed and has qualified, whichever is later.
1919
2020 (2) On and after July 1, 2010, the Bradley Board of Directors shall consist of the Commissioner of Transportation and the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, each serving ex officio, and seven members appointed with the advice and consent of the General Assembly, as follows: A member appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives from the Connecticut Transportation Strategy Board established by section 13b-57e; a member appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives from among the members of the Bradley International Community Advisory Board established by section 15-101pp, and five private sector members appointed as follows: (A) The Governor shall appoint three members, one of whom shall be the chairperson, (B) the president pro tempore of the Senate shall appoint one member, and (C) the minority leader of the Senate shall appoint one member. The term of office of each appointed member shall be four years from the date of appointment, or until such member's successor is appointed and has qualified, whichever is later.
2121
2222 Sec. 2. Section 15-101nn of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2010):
2323
2424 The Bradley Board of Directors shall have the duty and authority to: (1) [In consultation with the Commissioner of Transportation, develop] Develop an organizational and management structure that will best accomplish the goals of Bradley International Airport; (2) approve the annual capital and operating budget of Bradley International Airport; (3) act in cooperation with the Connecticut Transportation Strategy Board, created pursuant to section 13b-57e; (4) advocate for Bradley International Airport's interests and ensure that Bradley International Airport's potential as an economic development resource for the state and region are fully realized; (5) ensure that an appropriate mission statement and set of strategic goals for Bradley International Airport are established and that progress toward accomplishing the mission and strategic goals is regularly assessed; (6) approve Bradley International Airport's master plan; (7) establish and review policies and plans for marketing the airport and for determining the best use of airport property; (8) ensure appropriate independent expertise is available to advise the Bradley Board of Directors, particularly in the areas of strategy and marketing and select consultants as necessary, for purposes related to strategy and marketing, pursuant to procedures established by the board; (9) employ managerial employees, as defined in section 5-270, and establish the salary of such employees, which shall be paid from the Bradley Enterprise Fund; (10) ensure customer service standards, performance targets and performance assessment systems are established for the airport enterprise; [(10)] (11) approve community relations policies and ensure that the community advisory board, created pursuant to section 15-101pp, operates effectively to ensure that community comment and information is regularly and fully considered in decisions related to Bradley International Airport; [(11)] (12) create a code of conduct for the Bradley Board of Directors consistent with part I of chapter 10; [(12)] (13) report to the Governor and the General Assembly on an annual basis; [(13)] (14) establish procedures to review and approve significant contracts, other than collective bargaining agreements, relating to the operation of Bradley International Airport prior to approval; [, which procedures shall require completion of each such review no later than ten business days after the board receives the contract; and (14)] (15) develop, jointly, with the State Contracting Standards Board, on or before June 30, 2011, a streamlined competitive bidding procedure for the selection of construction contractors, airport vendors and professional and other services. Such bidding procedure shall comply with all federal requirements for the receipt of federal funds for the airport; and (16) adopt rules for the conduct of its business which shall not be considered regulations, as defined in subdivision (13) of section 4-166.
2525
2626 Sec. 3. Section 15-101oo of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2010):
2727
2828 [For administrative purposes only, the] The Bradley Board of Directors shall [perform its functions] be within the Department of Transportation, for administrative purposes only. The administrative functions of the board of directors shall be performed by the Department of Transportation and the costs thereof [, including the] may be reimbursed by the Bradley Enterprise Fund. The cost of consultants [recommended to advise] selected by the Bradley Board of Directors [,] may be reimbursed or paid by the Bradley Enterprise Fund. Consultants [recommended] selected by the Bradley Board of Directors shall be engaged by the Department of Transportation but shall report to the Bradley Board of Directors. The selection and engagement of consultants [for] by the Bradley Board of Directors shall be exempt from sections 13b-20b to 13b-20m, inclusive, and sections 4-212 to 4-219, inclusive.
2929
3030 Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) The Bradley Board of Directors shall study the functions and activities of said board and airport that are subject to any provision of the general statutes or of any public or special act, in order to determine if any such provisions prevent or delay the ability of the board to discharge its legal duties and responsibilities for the operation and development of the airport. The board shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and Bradley International Airport, not later than February 15, 2011, with respect to any such provision and shall (1) describe the specific manner in which such provision results in prevention or delay, and (2) make recommendations for amendment, repeal or exemption from such provisions.
3131
3232
3333
3434
3535 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3636 Section 1 July 1, 2010 15-101mm(b)
3737 Sec. 2 July 1, 2010 15-101nn
3838 Sec. 3 July 1, 2010 15-101oo
3939 Sec. 4 from passage New section
4040
4141 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4242
4343 Section 1
4444
4545 July 1, 2010
4646
4747 15-101mm(b)
4848
4949 Sec. 2
5050
5151 July 1, 2010
5252
5353 15-101nn
5454
5555 Sec. 3
5656
5757 July 1, 2010
5858
5959 15-101oo
6060
6161 Sec. 4
6262
6363 from passage
6464
6565 New section
6666
6767
6868
6969 CE Joint Favorable Subst.-LCO
7070 TRA Joint Favorable
71-GAE Joint Favorable
7271
7372 CE
7473
7574 Joint Favorable Subst.-LCO
7675
7776 TRA
7877
7978 Joint Favorable
80-
81-GAE
82-
83-Joint Favorable