04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/30/2010 | File Number 194 | |||
03/30/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 147 | |||
03/30/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/30/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/18/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/04/2010 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |