04/01/2010 | File Number 248 | |||
04/01/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 177 | |||
04/01/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/01/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/19/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Environment | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/23/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |