|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Public Act 10-116
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 505
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4431
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
File Number 344
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 230
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|