04/15/2010 | File Number 576 | |||
04/15/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 394 | |||
04/15/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/15/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/01/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/01/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/22/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/17/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |