Connecticut 2010 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00290 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 290
2-February Session, 2010 *_____SB00290APP___040110____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 290
2+February Session, 2010 LCO No. 1291
3+ *_____SB00290GAEAPP031810____*
4+Referred to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
5+Introduced by:
6+(GAE)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 290
10+Raised Bill No. 290
711
812 February Session, 2010
913
10-*_____SB00290APP___040110____*
14+LCO No. 1291
15+
16+*_____SB00290GAEAPP031810____*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(GAE)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING THE PUBLICATION OF STATE AGENCY REGULATIONS ON THE INTERNET.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. Section 4-173 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2010):
1729
1830 (a) The Commission on Official Legal Publications shall publish and distribute a compilation of all effective regulations adopted by all state agencies subsequent to October 27, 1970, except regulations adopted pursuant to subsection (f) of section 4-168. Such publication may be a supplement to or revision of the most current compilation, and shall be published at least semiannually. The Commission on Official Legal Publications may omit from such compilation (1) any regulation that is incorporated by reference into a Connecticut regulation and published by or otherwise available in printed form from a federal agency, a government agency of another state or a commercial publishing company, (2) any regulation that is too expensive to publish, or (3) any regulation the publication of which would be unduly cumbersome. If the commission omits a regulation from the compilation, it shall publish in the compilation a notice identifying the omitted regulation, stating the general subject matter of the regulation and stating an address, telephone number and any other information needed to obtain a copy of the regulation. Such address and telephone number shall be kept current in each semiannual publication of the compilation. The commission shall publish any regulation that has been omitted from publication under subdivision (2) of this subsection as soon as the commission has sufficient funds.
1931
2032 (b) The Commission on Official Legal Publications shall in addition cause to be published in the Connecticut Law Journal at least monthly the text of all regulations received by the commission from the office of the Secretary of the State pursuant to section 4-172 during the preceding month. The commission may omit from the Connecticut Law Journal (1) any regulation submitted in accordance with subsection (g) of section 4-168, for the purposes of renumbering sections only, if a correlated table of the former and new section numbers is published in lieu of the full text, (2) any regulation that is incorporated by reference into a Connecticut regulation and published by or otherwise available in printed form from a federal agency, a government agency of another state or a commercial publishing company, and (3) any regulation the publication of which would be too expensive or unduly cumbersome. If the commission omits a regulation from publication in the Connecticut Law Journal under subdivision (2) or (3) of this subsection, the commission shall publish in the Connecticut Law Journal a notice identifying the omitted regulation, stating the general subject matter of the regulation and stating an address, telephone number and any other information needed to obtain a copy of the regulation.
2133
22-(c) Each agency which adopts a regulation shall make the regulation available for inspection and copying at its main office. On and after October 1, 2011, each agency shall post on its Internet web site any regulation of such agency that is published pursuant to subsection (b) of this section on or after said date. Not later than January 1, 2012, each such agency shall post on its web site any effective regulation of such agency.
34+(c) Not later than July 1, 2011, the Department of Information Technology, in consultation with the Commission on Official Legal Publications, shall develop a computer program that enables each state agency to post on its Internet web site any regulation published pursuant to subsection (b) of this section.
2335
24-(d) Any publication made pursuant to subsections (a) and (b) of this section shall be made available upon request to agencies and officials of this state free of charge, and to other persons at prices fixed by the Commission on Official Legal Publications, in accordance with section 51-216b.
36+[(c)] (d) Each agency which adopts a regulation shall make the regulation available for inspection and copying at its main office. On and after October 1, 2011, each agency shall post on its Internet web site any regulation of such agency that is published pursuant to subsection (b) of this section on or after said date. Not later than January 1, 2012, each such agency shall post on its web site any effective regulation of such agency.
2537
26-(e) The compilation of regulations published under subsection (a) of this section and all Connecticut regulations omitted from the compilation under subsection (a) shall be maintained in the reference collection of each law library described in section 11-19a.
38+[(d)] (e) Any publication made pursuant to subsections (a) and (b) of this section shall be made available upon request to agencies and officials of this state free of charge, and to other persons at prices fixed by the Commission on Official Legal Publications, in accordance with section 51-216b.
39+
40+[(e)] (f) The compilation of regulations published under subsection (a) of this section and all Connecticut regulations omitted from the compilation under subsection (a) shall be maintained in the reference collection of each law library described in section 11-19a.
2741
2842
2943
3044
3145 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3246 Section 1 October 1, 2010 4-173
3347
3448 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3549
3650 Section 1
3751
3852 October 1, 2010
3953
4054 4-173
4155
4256
4357
4458 GAE Joint Favorable C/R APP
45-APP Joint Favorable Subst.
4659
4760 GAE
4861
4962 Joint Favorable C/R
5063
5164 APP
52-
53-APP
54-
55-Joint Favorable Subst.