Connecticut 2010 2010 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00290 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2010

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 290
February Session, 2010  LCO No. 1291
 *_____SB00290GAEAPP031810____*
Referred to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Introduced by:
(GAE)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 290 

February Session, 2010

LCO No. 1291

*_____SB00290GAEAPP031810____*

Referred to Committee on Government Administration and Elections 

Introduced by:

(GAE)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE PUBLICATION OF STATE AGENCY REGULATIONS ON THE INTERNET. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 4-173 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2010):

(a) The Commission on Official Legal Publications shall publish and distribute a compilation of all effective regulations adopted by all state agencies subsequent to October 27, 1970, except regulations adopted pursuant to subsection (f) of section 4-168. Such publication may be a supplement to or revision of the most current compilation, and shall be published at least semiannually. The Commission on Official Legal Publications may omit from such compilation (1) any regulation that is incorporated by reference into a Connecticut regulation and published by or otherwise available in printed form from a federal agency, a government agency of another state or a commercial publishing company, (2) any regulation that is too expensive to publish, or (3) any regulation the publication of which would be unduly cumbersome. If the commission omits a regulation from the compilation, it shall publish in the compilation a notice identifying the omitted regulation, stating the general subject matter of the regulation and stating an address, telephone number and any other information needed to obtain a copy of the regulation. Such address and telephone number shall be kept current in each semiannual publication of the compilation. The commission shall publish any regulation that has been omitted from publication under subdivision (2) of this subsection as soon as the commission has sufficient funds.

(b) The Commission on Official Legal Publications shall in addition cause to be published in the Connecticut Law Journal at least monthly the text of all regulations received by the commission from the office of the Secretary of the State pursuant to section 4-172 during the preceding month. The commission may omit from the Connecticut Law Journal (1) any regulation submitted in accordance with subsection (g) of section 4-168, for the purposes of renumbering sections only, if a correlated table of the former and new section numbers is published in lieu of the full text, (2) any regulation that is incorporated by reference into a Connecticut regulation and published by or otherwise available in printed form from a federal agency, a government agency of another state or a commercial publishing company, and (3) any regulation the publication of which would be too expensive or unduly cumbersome. If the commission omits a regulation from publication in the Connecticut Law Journal under subdivision (2) or (3) of this subsection, the commission shall publish in the Connecticut Law Journal a notice identifying the omitted regulation, stating the general subject matter of the regulation and stating an address, telephone number and any other information needed to obtain a copy of the regulation.

(c) Not later than July 1, 2011, the Department of Information Technology, in consultation with the Commission on Official Legal Publications, shall develop a computer program that enables each state agency to post on its Internet web site any regulation published pursuant to subsection (b) of this section.

[(c)] (d) Each agency which adopts a regulation shall make the regulation available for inspection and copying at its main office. On and after October 1, 2011, each agency shall post on its Internet web site any regulation of such agency that is published pursuant to subsection (b) of this section on or after said date. Not later than January 1, 2012, each such agency shall post on its web site any effective regulation of such agency.

[(d)] (e) Any publication made pursuant to subsections (a) and (b) of this section shall be made available upon request to agencies and officials of this state free of charge, and to other persons at prices fixed by the Commission on Official Legal Publications, in accordance with section 51-216b.

[(e)] (f) The compilation of regulations published under subsection (a) of this section and all Connecticut regulations omitted from the compilation under subsection (a) shall be maintained in the reference collection of each law library described in section 11-19a.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2010 4-173

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2010

4-173

 

GAE Joint Favorable C/R APP

GAE

Joint Favorable C/R

APP