04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/26/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/22/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/30/2010 | File Number 201 | |||
03/30/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 146 | |||
03/23/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/11/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/09/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety |