|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 509
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5421
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
File Number 172
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 122
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|