Connecticut 2010 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00319 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 319
2-February Session, 2010 *_____SB00319PD____042110____*
2+February Session, 2010 *_____SB00319CE____041410____*
33
44 General Assembly
55
66 Substitute Bill No. 319
77
88 February Session, 2010
99
10-*_____SB00319PD____042110____*
10+*_____SB00319CE____041410____*
1111
1212 AN ACT CONCERNING AN URBAN HOMESTEADING PILOT PROGRAM.
1313
1414 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1515
1616 Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2010) (a) The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority, in consultation with the Department of Economic and Community Development, shall establish a pilot program to promote the revitalization and stabilization of urban neighborhoods by encouraging home ownership by persons who will become owner-occupants of two to four-family homes. The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority may administer the program through one or more nonprofit organizations. The goal of the program shall be to increase home ownership in targeted neighborhoods with high proportions of two to four-family homes, giving priority to promoting owner occupation in buildings that are vacant, bank-owned or investor-owned. The program shall: (1) Incorporate support services for persons participating in the program to maximize the likelihood of their success in maintaining home ownership on a long-term basis; (2) be implemented in up to three municipalities that are recipients of grants under the federal Neighborhood Stabilization Program established under Title III of Division B of the Housing and Economic Recovery Act of 2008 or under the federal Neighborhood Stabilization Program 2 established under Title XII of Division A of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009; (3) identify funding resources that may be used to purchase two to four-family homes and to repair or rehabilitate such homes as necessary for occupancy; (4) identify incentives to encourage lender participation; (5) assist participants in locating purchase financing and provide counseling before and after any purchase, including training in skills necessary to be an effective landlord and assistance resolving problems that may arise after closing on a home; (6) encourage and recruit community stakeholders such as local banks, local boards of realtors, neighborhood revitalization zone committees and similar entities to provide active support for the program; (7) require persons participating in the program to agree to occupy any home purchased under the program as their primary residence for not less than seven years; and (8) identify mortgage financing to make loans partially forgivable upon compliance with the requirement identified in subdivision (7) of this subsection. Priority for participation in the program may be given to persons who will become first-time homebuyers and to persons who are already living in a neighborhood that is being targeted by the program.
1717
1818 (b) The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority shall establish the parameters of the program not later than October 1, 2010, and shall designate up to three municipalities to participate in such program not later than January 1, 2011. The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, shall submit to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to housing (1) a status report on the program not later than February 1, 2011; (2) an interim report on the program not later than January 1, 2012; and (3) a final report on the program not later than January 1, 2013.
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2424 Section 1 July 1, 2010 New section
2525
2626 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2727
2828 Section 1
2929
3030 July 1, 2010
3131
3232 New section
3333
3434
3535
3636 HSG Joint Favorable Subst.
3737 CE Joint Favorable
38-PD Joint Favorable
3938
4039 HSG
4140
4241 Joint Favorable Subst.
4342
4443 CE
4544
4645 Joint Favorable
47-
48-PD
49-
50-Joint Favorable