|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Public Act 10-153
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5082
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Calendar Number 434
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3956
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
File Number 261
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 191
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|