|
06/03/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Public Act 10-109
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 517
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4381
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
File Number 235
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 164
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|