03/28/2011 | File Number 231 | |||
03/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 142 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/07/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
02/22/2011 | Drafted by Committee |