|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Public Act 11-93
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
File Number 892
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 634
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8032
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8146
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
File Number 784
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
House Calendar Number 471
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute APP
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|