LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05431
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05431
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05431
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 21, 2011
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 11, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 28, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 3, 2011
Compare
Bill
January 27, 2011
Compare