|
07/08/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Public Act 11-95
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 537
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
File Number 471
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
House Calendar Number 267
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|