|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Special Act 11-7
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 569
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
File Number 381
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 229
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|