02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/03/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
01/28/2011 | Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |||
01/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |