03/24/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
03/16/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/15/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/01/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |