03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |||
03/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/02/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/14/2011 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
02/07/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |||
02/01/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
02/01/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference Transportation | |||
01/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |