04/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/30/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute APP | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |||
01/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |