|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Special Act 11-9
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 568
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
File Number 759
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable APP
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
File Number 193
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
House Calendar Number 129
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|