LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06103
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06103
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06103
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 24, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 24, 2011
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 17, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 8, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 24, 2011
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2011
Compare
Bill
Compare