|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Special Act 11-10
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
File Number 673
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 421
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5354
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
File Number 404
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
House Calendar Number 249
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|