|
06/02/2011
|
File Number 879
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 603
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7828
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7435
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
File Number 779
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
File Number 384
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 232
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|