04/29/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/29/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 99 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 77 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/07 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |