05/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/20/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2011 | Public Act 11-14 | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 415 | |||
04/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 240 | |||
03/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 151 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/14/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |