|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-251
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8559
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
File Number 803
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 507
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6138
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
File Number 317
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
House Calendar Number 190
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|