07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-199 | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 426 | |||
04/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/29/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/17/2011 | File Number 85 | |||
03/17/2011 | House Calendar Number 69 | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/08/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |