05/11/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 275 | |||
03/29/2011 | House Calendar Number 172 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/08/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |