|
05/03/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
File Number 591
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
House Calendar Number 351
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|