|
05/09/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 475
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
File Number 485
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
House Calendar Number 284
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable HS
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|