Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06340 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6340
2-January Session, 2011 *_____HB06340JUD___042911____*
2+January Session, 2011 *_____HB06340HS____032311____*
33
44 General Assembly
55
66 Substitute Bill No. 6340
77
88 January Session, 2011
99
10-*_____HB06340JUD___042911____*
10+*_____HB06340HS____032311____*
1111
1212 AN ACT CONCERNING THE PLACEMENT OF CHILDREN IN OUT-OF-STATE TREATMENT FACILITIES.
1313
1414 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1515
1616 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than July 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Children and Families shall return each child and youth in the commissioner's care and custody who is located in an out-of-state treatment facility to a family or facility in the state, unless the commissioner determines that an out-of-state placement is necessary because (1) the child or youth has a behavioral health condition requiring specialized treatment that cannot be effectively provided in the state, or (2) the out-of-state facility provides geographic proximity to the child or youth's family that will facilitate family involvement in the child or youth's treatment.
1717
1818 (b) On or after July 1, 2013, if the commissioner determines that a child or youth in the commissioner's care and custody should be placed in an out-of-state treatment facility, the commissioner shall submit a motion for review of such out-of-state placement determination to the superior court for juvenile matters. The court shall determine whether such out-of-state placement is necessary because (1) the child or youth has a behavioral health condition requiring specialized treatment that cannot be effectively provided in the state, or (2) the out-of-state facility provides geographic proximity to the child or youth's family that will encourage and facilitate family involvement in the child or youth's treatment. If the court determines that such placement is necessary, the commissioner shall, every three months, submit a report to the court regarding the child or youth's status and the commissioner's plan to return the child to a family or facility in the state.
1919
2020 Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Children and Families shall, in consultation with the Court Support Services Division of the Judicial Branch, in-state and out-of-state treatment providers, child welfare and mental health advocates and family consumers of mental health and child welfare services, develop a plan to reallocate funds appropriated to the department and maximize federal and private funding to increase appropriate in-state, community-based and residential services for children transitioning from out-of-state facilities. Not later than January 1, 2013, the commissioner shall submit such plan, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to human services and the select committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children.
2121
2222 Sec. 3. Section 17a-62 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2011):
2323
2424 On or before [February 1, 2010] May 1, 2012, and annually thereafter, the Commissioner of Children and Families shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to human services and the select committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children. The report shall include the following information, for the preceding calendar year, for children and youth in the custody of the Department of Children and Families: (1) The number, [and] age and race of such children and youth who are living in a psychiatric hospital or out-of-state residential treatment center, the average length of stay for such children and youth, the number of children and youth who have overstayed their estimated placement time in such placements and an analysis of the reasons for the placements out of state and overstays; (2) the number, [and] age and race of such children and youth who are runaways or homeless, the number of days that each child or youth has been a runaway or homeless, and an analysis of the trends relating to runaways and homelessness; (3) the number, [and] age and race of children and youth who have a permanency plan of another planned permanency living arrangement and an analysis of the trends relating to permanency plans; and (4) the number, [and] age and race of children and youth who have refused services offered by the department and an analysis of the trends relating to participation in services. The commissioner shall conduct case and service reviews for each child in the groups described in subdivisions (1) to (4), inclusive, of this section.
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3030 Section 1 from passage New section
3131 Sec. 2 from passage New section
3232 Sec. 3 October 1, 2011 17a-62
3333
3434 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3535
3636 Section 1
3737
3838 from passage
3939
4040 New section
4141
4242 Sec. 2
4343
4444 from passage
4545
4646 New section
4747
4848 Sec. 3
4949
5050 October 1, 2011
5151
5252 17a-62
5353
5454
5555
5656 KID Joint Favorable C/R HS
5757 HS Joint Favorable Subst.
58-JUD Joint Favorable
5958
6059 KID
6160
6261 Joint Favorable C/R
6362
6463 HS
6564
6665 HS
6766
6867 Joint Favorable Subst.
69-
70-JUD
71-
72-Joint Favorable